EP0010992 - Process for the preparation of 1-hydroxylated vitamin D compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESEARCH INSTITUTE FOR MEDICINE AND CHEMISTRY INC. 49 Amherst Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | [1980/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hesse, Robert Henry 49 Amherst Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02142 / US | 02 /
Johnson, Graham 6 Golden Drive Eaglestone Estate Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire / GB | [1980/10] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302488.6 | 06.11.1979 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | GB19430045878 | 07.11.1978 Original published format: GB 4345878 | [1980/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010992 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010992 | Date: | 05.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07C172/00 | [1980/10] | CPC: |
C07C401/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1-Hydroxy-Vitamin-D-Verbindungen | [1980/10] | English: | Process for the preparation of 1-hydroxylated vitamin D compounds | [1980/10] | French: | Procédé de préparation de vitamines D 1-hydroxylées | [1980/10] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/04] | 28.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [P]GB2013686 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND) | [XD] - STEROIDS, vol. 30, no. 2, August 1977, pages 193-201, San Francisco, U.S.A.BOHUMIL PELC: "The Selenium Dioxide Oxidation of Cholecalciferol". | [D] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 15, 09-10-1978, page 619, no. 129796f, Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A., H.E. PAAREN et al.: "Direct C-1 hydroxylation of vitamin D compounds: Convenient preparation of 1 alpha-hydroxyvitamin D3, 1 alpha, 25-dihydroxyvitamin D3, and 1 alpha-hydroxyvitamin D2", & PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., 1978, 75 (5)2080-1 (Eng.). |