EP0011447 - Blood platelet aggregation inhibitory 1-benzyl-1,2,5,6-tetrahydropyridine-3-carboxylic acid derivatives and salts thereof; pharmaceutical compositions thereof; and analogy processes for the manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1980/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howe, Ralph Little Beck Upton Macclesfield Cheshire / GB | 02 /
Mills, Stuart Dennett 17 Harrington Drive Gawsworth Macclesfield Cheshire / GB | [1980/11] | Representative(s) | Smith, Stephen Collyer, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | Smith, Stephen Collyer, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | ||
Former [1980/11] | Smith, Stephen Collyer Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents Thames House North Millbank London SW1P 4QG / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302507.3 | 08.11.1979 | [1980/11] | Priority number, date | GB19440098778 | 17.11.1978 Original published format: GB 4498778 | GB19790032817 | 21.09.1979 Original published format: GB 7932817 | [1980/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011447 | Date: | 28.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011447 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/78, A61K31/44 | [1980/11] | CPC: |
C07D211/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/11] | Title | German: | Die Blutplättchenaggregation inhibierende Derivate der 1-Benzyl-1,2,5,6-tetrahydropyridin-3-carbonsäure und ihre Salze, diese Verbindungen enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1980/11] | English: | Blood platelet aggregation inhibitory 1-benzyl-1,2,5,6-tetrahydropyridine-3-carboxylic acid derivatives and salts thereof; pharmaceutical compositions thereof; and analogy processes for the manufacture thereof | [1980/11] | French: | Dérivés de l'acide 1-benzyl-1,2,5,6-tétrahydropyridine-3-carboxylique et leurs sels, inhibant l'agglomération plaquettaire sanguine, compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant et procédés pour leur préparation | [1980/11] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/18] | 19.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2221770 [ ] (BAYER AG) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS Vol. 52, No. 11, 10 June 1958 Columbus, Ohio, USA N.A. PREOBRAZHENSKII et al. "Synthesis of alkaloid arecoline and its homologs" column 9162 c-i & Zhur. Obshchei Khim. Vol. 271957 pages 3162 to 3170. |