EP0013071 - Pyrimidinone derivatives, processes for preparing them and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.1984 [1984/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITH KLINE & FRENCH LABORATORIES LIMITED Mundells Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire, AL7 1EY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states SMITH KLINE & FRENCH LABORATORIES LIMITED Mundells Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire, AL7 1EY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Thomas Henry 17 Godfries Close Tewin, Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
Ife, Robert John 19 Mobbsbury Way Stevenage, Hertfordshire / GB | [1980/14] | Representative(s) | Hargreaves, Gerald Henry, et al P.O.Box 39 Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1EY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/46] | Hargreaves, Gerald Henry, Dr., et al P.O.Box 39 Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1EY / GB | ||
Former [1980/22] | Hargreaves, Gerald Henry, Dr. P.O.Box 39 Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1EY / GB | ||
Former [1980/14] | Hargreaves, Gerald Henry, Dr. P.O.Box 39 Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302509.9 | 08.11.1979 | [1980/14] | Priority number, date | GB19440026078 | 13.11.1978 Original published format: GB 4426078 | GB19790029013 | 21.08.1979 Original published format: GB 7929013 | [1980/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013071 | Date: | 09.07.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013071 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/46, C07D401/06, C07D401/12, C07D403/06, C07D403/12, C07D405/06, C07D405/12, A61K31/505 | [1980/14] | CPC: |
C07D239/47 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/14] | Title | German: | Pyrimidinon-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und sie enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1980/14] | English: | Pyrimidinone derivatives, processes for preparing them and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1980/14] | French: | Dérivés de pyrimidinone, procédés pour leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1980/14] | Examination procedure | 15.08.1980 | Examination requested [1980/23] | 14.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.04.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1223686 [ ] (ICI LTD [GB]); | GB1419994 [ ] (SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB); | FR2326192 [ ] (SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB [GB]); | FR2336935 [ ] (SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB [GB]) |