EP0014286 - Variable delivery pump control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.1985 [1985/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL SIGNAL CORPORATION PO Box 10010 High Ridge Park Stamford Connecticut 06904 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states GENERAL SIGNAL CORPORATION PO Box 10010 High Ridge Park Stamford Connecticut 06904 / US | ||
Former [1980/17] | For all designated states GENERAL SIGNAL CORPORATION High Ridge Park Stamford Connecticut 06904 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Young, John Ernest Gilbert 1502 Amherst Street Watertown, New York 13601 / US | [1980/17] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/17] | Milhench, Howard Leslie A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303/306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302636.0 | 20.11.1979 | [1980/17] | Priority number, date | US19780966835 | 06.12.1978 Original published format: US 966835 | [1980/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0014286 | Date: | 20.08.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0014286 | Date: | 22.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0014286 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F16H39/46 | [1980/17] | CPC: |
F16H61/46 (EP,US);
F16H61/438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/17] | Title | German: | Steuersystem für Pumpe mit veränderlicher Lieferung | [1980/17] | English: | Variable delivery pump control system | [1980/17] | French: | Commande pour pompe à débit variable | [1980/17] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 21.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/28] | 17.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.06.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2896411 [ ] (BOWERS ERIC H, et al); | US3127745 [ ] (YOUNG JOHN E G); | FR1373645 [ ]; | US3166891 [ ] (WEISENBACH CHARLES O); | US3669570 [ ] (HIMMLER CONRAD RICHARD); | US3885388 [ ] (CRULL STANLEY W); | US3946560 [ ] (MAC INTOSH DONALD J, et al); | GB1558362 [ ] (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) |