EP0016288 - Positive displacement pump systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.1983 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOBOURN-EATON LIMITED Priory Road Strood Rochester, Kent ME2 2BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states HOBOURN-EATON LIMITED Priory Road Strood Rochester, Kent ME2 2BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bristow, Ian Trevor 4 Hayes Close Higham, Kent / GB | 02 /
Thornelow, Alec 67 Ingle Road Chatham, Kent / GB | [1980/20] | Representative(s) | Brooke-Smith, Fred Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | [1980/20] | Application number, filing date | 79302782.2 | 04.12.1979 | [1980/20] | Priority number, date | GB19480027178 | 13.12.1978 Original published format: GB 4827178 | [1980/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016288 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/04 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
F04C14/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1980/20] | Title | German: | Verdrängerpumpen-Systeme | [1980/20] | English: | Positive displacement pump systems | [1980/20] | French: | Systèmes de pompes à déplacement positif | [1980/20] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 27.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/23] | 05.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1983/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2036348 [ ] (TRAILOR REMORQUES); | US3067689 [ ] (HAUSE GILBERT K); | US2440371 [ ] (HOLLEY JR GEORGE M); | FR1004798 [ ] (SNECMA) |