EP0012588 - Method and apparatus for preparing moulded wafers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LU
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LU
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1980/13] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LU
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stave, Gerhard Julius Roentgenstraat 13 The Hague / NL | [1980/13] | Representative(s) | Stancliffe, Terence Christopher, et al UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/08] | Stancliffe, Terence Christopher, et al UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1980/13] | Stancliffe, Terence Christopher UNILEVER PLC Patents Division P.O. Box 68 Unilever House London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 79302841.6 | 10.12.1979 | [1980/13] | Priority number, date | NL19780011970 | 08.12.1978 Original published format: NL 7811970 | [1980/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012588 | Date: | 25.06.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0012588 | Date: | 23.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A21C15/02, A21B5/02 | [1980/13] | CPC: |
A21C15/025 (EP);
A21B5/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von geformten Waffeln | [1980/13] | English: | Method and apparatus for preparing moulded wafers | [1980/13] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la préparation de gaufres moulées | [1980/13] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/09] | 11.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.08.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2069027 [ ] (JAMES BALTON); | GB1245476 [ ] (RAHM JOSSE [BE]); | DE2508533 [ ] (MADSEN FRITZ VIGGO FRIBERG) | Examination | US1851578 | AT275446B | US3541587 |