EP0013152 - Marker sleeves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1982 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.H. Brady Co. 727 West Glendale Avenue Milwaukee Wisconsin 53201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states W.H. Brady Co. 727 West Glendale Avenue Milwaukee Wisconsin 53201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbieri, Joseph C. 3023 El Camino Cedarburg, Wisconsin 53012 / US | [1980/14] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Langner Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Isartorplatz 5 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79302997.6 | 20.12.1979 | [1980/14] | Priority number, date | US19780972934 | 26.12.1978 Original published format: US 972934 | [1980/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013152 | Date: | 09.07.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/36, G09F3/06 | [1980/14] | CPC: |
G09F3/06 (EP,US);
H01B7/368 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1980/14] | Title | German: | Markierungshülsen | [1980/14] | English: | Marker sleeves | [1980/14] | French: | Colliers de marquage | [1980/14] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 30.09.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 06.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1983/08] | 17.12.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3491472 [ ] (WALLDORF DIANN JOHNS); | FR2254256 [ ] (MULLER YVETTE [FR]); | FR2307391 [ ] (FEHR RUDOLF [CH]) |