EP0013171 - Induction motor drive apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.1985 [1985/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | ||
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states Fanuc Ltd 5-1, Asahigaoka, 3-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawada, Shigeki 346-15, Oaza-Shimoda Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Hiroshi 2-73, Matsubara-cho, 2-chome Hamura-machi Nishitama-gun Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Koiwai, Yutaka 12-27, Kita-shinjuku, 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Toyko / JP | [1980/14] | Representative(s) | Overbury, Richard Douglas, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | Overbury, Richard Douglas, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 79303030.5 | 21.12.1979 | [1980/14] | Priority number, date | JP19780164135 | 30.12.1978 Original published format: JP 16413578 | [1980/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013171 | Date: | 09.07.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013171 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/40 | [1980/14] | CPC: |
H02P27/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/14] | Title | German: | Regelgerät für einen Induktionsmotor | [1980/14] | English: | Induction motor drive apparatus | [1980/14] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour moteur à induction | [1980/14] | File destroyed: | 05.09.1996 | Examination procedure | 19.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/09] | 10.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3899725 [ ] (PLUNKETT ALLAN B); | US3962614 [ ] (RETTIG CHARLES E); | US4001660 [ ] (LIPO THOMAS A) | Examination | US3700986 | DE2521860 | EP0010981 |