EP0006814 - Riveting device using a hollow charge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETAT-FRANCAIS représenté par le Délégué Général pour l' Armement 16 bis, Avenue Prieur de la Côte d'Or 94114 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states ETAT-FRANCAIS représenté par le DELEGUE GENERAL POUR L'ARMEMENT Bureau des Brevets et Inventions de la Délégation Générale pour l'Armement 14, rue Saint-Dominique F-75997 Paris Armées / FR | ||
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states ETAT FRANCAIS représenté par le DELEGUE GENERAL pour L'ARMEMENT 14 rue Saint Dominique F-Paris 7ème / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnaison, Jean-Claude 1 Allée d'honneur 8, Place de la Pyrotechnie F-18000 Bourges / FR | 02 /
Lacote, Jean-Claude 122 chemin de Blet F-18000 Bourges / FR | [1980/01] | Application number, filing date | 79400434.1 | 28.06.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | FR19780019952 | 05.07.1978 Original published format: FR 7819952 | [1980/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0006814 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0006814 | Date: | 23.01.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006814 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B21J15/02, F42B1/02 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
F42D3/00 (EP,US);
B25C1/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/01] | B25C1/08, B21J15/18, F42B1/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, SE [1980/01] | Title | German: | Nietapparat mit einer Hohlsprengladung | [1980/01] | English: | Riveting device using a hollow charge | [1980/01] | French: | Dispositif de rivetage utilisant une charge creuse | [1981/52] |
Former [1980/01] | Nouveau dispositif de rivetage utilisant une charge creuse | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/13] | 22.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 09.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1981 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.12.1981 | SE | 30.12.1981 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.12.1981 | |
SE | 30.12.1981 | ||
Former [1982/31] | SE | 30.12.1981 | Documents cited: | Search | US2455825 [ ] (ROBERT TEMPLE); | US2796833 [ ] (SWEETMAN WILLIAM G); | FR2331425 [ ] (ALSETEX [FR]) |