EP0008272 - Means for applying at some distance from a wall a cladding composed of a plurality of panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFAMA S.A. 52 Boulevard du Roi René F-49000 Angers / FR | [1980/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viemon, Bernard 25, rue Louis Monternault F-49800 Trelaze / FR | [1980/04] | Representative(s) | Mas, Paul Louis CABINET BONNET THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais 75003 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/04] | Mas, Paul Louis CABINET BONNET THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400552.0 | 03.08.1979 | [1980/04] | Priority number, date | FR19780023213 | 07.08.1978 Original published format: FR 7823213 | [1980/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0008272 | Date: | 20.02.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0008272 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/60, E04F13/08 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
E04F13/0808 (EP);
E04F13/0816 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/04] | E04F13/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung einer Verkleidung, bestehend aus einer Vielzahl von Panelen, auf Abstand zu einer Wand | [1980/04] | English: | Means for applying at some distance from a wall a cladding composed of a plurality of panels | [1980/04] | French: | Dispositif pour l'accrochage, à distance d'une paroi, d'un revêtement constitué d'une pluralité de panneaux | [1980/04] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/13] | 26.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 30.12.1981 | SE | 30.12.1981 | LU | 31.08.1982 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/48] | NL | 30.12.1981 | |
SE | 30.12.1981 | ||
Former [1982/31] | SE | 30.12.1981 | Documents cited: | Search | US3621635 [ ] (LANGE CORNELIS J DE); | FR2308746 [ ] (SAFAMA [FR]) |