EP0010019 - Transversal levelling mechanism for stationary trailers (in particular for caravans) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1981 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.1981 [1981/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mulot, Georges Route du Valmartin 3, le bois des Arpents F-78860 St. Nom la Breteche / FR | For all designated states Mulot, Suzette Route du Valmartin 3, le bois des Arpents F-78860 St. Nom la Breteche / FR | [1980/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/08] | Application number, filing date | 79400645.2 | 14.09.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | FR19780026388 | 14.09.1978 Original published format: FR 7826388 | FR19780036510 | 27.12.1978 Original published format: FR 7836510 | [1980/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010019 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/00, B60G19/02 | [1980/08] | CPC: |
B60G21/0555 (EP);
B60G17/021 (EP);
B60G17/025 (EP);
B60G17/033 (EP);
B60G2202/42 (EP);
B60G2204/419 (EP);
B60G2204/4193 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, NL [1980/08] | Title | German: | Transversale Niveauausgleichsvorrichtung für parkende Anhänger (insbesondere für Wohnwagen) | [1980/08] | English: | Transversal levelling mechanism for stationary trailers (in particular for caravans) | [1980/08] | French: | Dispositif de nivellement transversal de remorques en stationnement (en particulier des caravanes) | [1980/08] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1981/21] | 23.02.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1319231 [ ]; | US1353393 [ ]; | GB964932 [ ]; | DE1087465 [ ]; | FR1578778 [ ]; | FR839856 [ ]; | FR803320 [ ]; | FR1525971 [ ]; | US2864626 [ ]; | FR1337204 [ ]; | FR796321 [ ]; | FR828405 [ ]; | FR36190E [ ]; | FR2191832 [ ]; | US3704897 [ ] (BAGGE WALTER, et al) |