EP0011005 - Sampling head for the coolant of a nuclear reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVATOME 20 Avenue Edouard Herriot F-92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | [1980/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deverger, Christian 3 rue Jean Mermoz F-78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
Le Baud, Patrice 12 rue St Méderic F-78000 Versailles / FR | 03 /
Perotto, Gérard 17 résidence les Rieux F-91120 Palaiseau / FR | [1980/10] | Representative(s) | Bouget, Lucien, et al CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier 75383 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | Bouget, Lucien, et al CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier F-75383 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400722.9 | 08.10.1979 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | FR19780030643 | 27.10.1978 Original published format: FR 7830643 | [1980/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011005 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011005 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G21C17/02, G01N1/12 | [1980/10] | CPC: |
G21C17/025 (EP);
G01N1/125 (EP);
G01N33/0093 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1980/10] | Title | German: | Probenahmekopf für Kühlmittel eines Kernreaktors | [1980/10] | English: | Sampling head for the coolant of a nuclear reactor | [1980/10] | French: | Tête de prélèvement d'agent de refroidissement dans un réacteur nucléaire | [1980/10] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 10.09.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.09.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2020129 [ ] (LE CIPROMEZ); | DE2521833 [ ] (KRUPP GMBH); | GB1466071 [ ] (BRITISH STEEL CORP) |