EP0012052 - Foam regulation process for plants producing acrylonitrile and acrylic esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P C U K PRODUITS CHIMIQUES UGINE KUHLMANN Service Propriété Industrielle Tour Manhattan 92087 Paris La Défense 2 Cédex 21 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states P C U K PRODUITS CHIMIQUES UGINE KUHLMANN Service Propriété Industrielle Tour Manhattan F-92087 Paris La Défense 2 Cédex 21 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruno, Francis 11, rue Marbeau F-75116 Paris / FR | 02 /
Konareff, Jean Route du Bas Privas Charly F-69390 Vernaison / FR | 03 /
Pardon, Louis 28, rue du 11 Novembre 1918 F-69230 Saint-Genis Laval / FR | [1980/12] | Representative(s) | Houssin, Jean, et al PRODUITS CHIMIQUES UGINE KUHLMANN Service Propriété Industrielle Tour Manhattan Cedex 21 92087 Paris La Defense 2 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | Houssin, Jean, et al PRODUITS CHIMIQUES UGINE KUHLMANN Service Propriété Industrielle Tour Manhattan Cedex 21 F-92087 Paris La Defense 2 / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400839.1 | 09.11.1979 | [1980/12] | Priority number, date | FR19780033781 | 30.11.1978 Original published format: FR 7833781 | [1980/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012052 | Date: | 11.06.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0012052 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B01D19/04, C07C121/32, C08G65/28, C11D1/722 | [1982/22] | CPC: |
B01D19/04 (EP);
B01D19/0404 (EP);
C07C67/62 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B01D19/0404, B01D19/0431 (EP);
C07C67/62, C07C69/54 (EP) |
Former IPC [1980/12] | B01D19/04, C07C121/32, C08G65/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regulierung von Schäumen in Akrylonitril -und Akrylester-Herstellungsanlagen | [1980/12] | English: | Foam regulation process for plants producing acrylonitrile and acrylic esters | [1980/12] | French: | Procédé de régulation des mousses dans les installations de fabrication de l'acrylonitrile et des esters acryliques | [1980/12] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1979 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 24.04.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.09.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.1981 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4105582 [ ]; | DE2252186 [ ]; | GB800159 [ ]; | FR2247532 [ ]; | GB1097491 [ ]; | DE2724349 [ ] |