EP0011564 - Method and apparatus for controlling the production of thermoplastic mineral fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1985 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1985 [1985/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISOVER SAINT-GOBAIN 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1983/35] |
Former [1980/11] | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN INDUSTRIES 62, Bd Victor Hugo F-92209 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sistermann, Klaus, Dipl. Ing. Am unteren Schlittberg D-6725 Roemerberg / DE | 02 /
Gaertner, Hans Ringstrasse 21 D-6701 Dannstadt / DE | [1980/11] | Representative(s) | Eudes, Marcel, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Eudes, Marcel, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc F-93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1983/35] | Eudes, Marcel Saint-Gobain Recherche 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc F-93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1980/11] | Eudes, Marcel SOFAB, 4, rue Diderot F-92156 Suresnes Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 79400858.1 | 13.11.1979 | [1980/11] | Priority number, date | DE19782849357 | 14.11.1978 Original published format: DE 2849357 | [1980/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011564 | Date: | 28.05.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011564 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/04, C03B37/06, D01D5/14, D01D5/18 | [1980/11] | CPC: |
C03B37/048 (EP,US);
C03B37/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Regeln der Produktion thermoplastischer Mineralfasern | [1980/11] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling the production of thermoplastic mineral fibres | [1980/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le réglage de la fabrication de fibres en matière thermoplastique | [1980/11] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 22.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 18.07.1984 | [1985/23] | Documents cited: | Search | US3395005 [ ] (JOHN STELMAH) |