EP0020842 - Double U-section upright with openings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/01] | Upright with openings | ||
[1983/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reith, Charles 14, rue Saint Louis en l'Ile F-75004 Paris / FR | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Roger-Petit, Jean-Camille, et al OFFICE BLETRY 2, Boulevard de Strasbourg F-75010 Paris / FR | [1981/01] | Application number, filing date | 79400986.0 | 07.12.1979 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | FR19790014725 | 08.06.1979 Original published format: FR 7914725 | [1981/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0020842 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0020842 | Date: | 15.07.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020842 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/14 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
A47B96/1458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | Ständer mit doppel-U-förmigem Querschnitt und Öffnungen | [1983/45] | English: | Double U-section upright with openings | [1983/45] | French: | Profilé à crémaillère à section en double U | [1983/45] |
Former [1981/01] | Mit Öffnungen versehener Ständer | ||
Former [1981/01] | Upright with openings | ||
Former [1981/01] | Profilé à crémaillère | Examination procedure | 31.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/43] | 24.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.04.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1983 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2080218 (LELEU ANDRE); | US3667177 [ ] (BIELA ELMER G); | CH611143 [ ] (HOOGSTRAAL AG [CH]) | Examination | FR2039207 |