EP0013235 - Electron multiplying apparatus with axial magnetic field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/14] | Electron multiplier tube with axial magnetic field | ||
[1984/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1985 [1985/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANVAR Agence Nationale de Valorisation de la Recherche 43, rue Caumartin F-75436 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | For all designated states ANVAR Agence Nationale de Valorisation de la Recherche 43, rue Caumartin F-75436 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states ANVAR Agence Nationale de Valorisation de la Recherche 13, rue Madeleine Michelis F-92522 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuroda, Kei-ichi 2A Chemin de Mouille-Galand CH-1214 Vernier Geneve / CH | 02 /
Sillou, Daniel 1, rue du Grand Bay Avanchet Parc CH-1220 Geneve / CH | 03 /
Takeuchi, Fujio 5660 Melvin Street Pittsburgh PA 15217 / US | [1980/14] | Representative(s) | Corre, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | Corre, Jacques Denis Paul, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 79401057.9 | 21.12.1979 | [1980/14] | Priority number, date | FR19780036148 | 22.12.1978 Original published format: FR 7836148 | [1980/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013235 | Date: | 09.07.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013235 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01J43/14, H01J43/22 | [1980/14] | CPC: |
H01J43/22 (EP,US);
H01J43/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/14] | Title | German: | Elektronenvervielfachungsvorrichtung mit axialem magnetischem Feld | [1984/11] | English: | Electron multiplying apparatus with axial magnetic field | [1984/11] | French: | Appareil multiplicateur d'électrons à champ magnétique axial | [1984/11] |
Former [1980/14] | Elektronenvervielfacherröhre mit axialem magnetischem Feld | ||
Former [1980/14] | Electron multiplier tube with axial magnetic field | ||
Former [1980/14] | Tube multiplicateur d'électrons à champ magnétique axial | Examination procedure | 26.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/05] | 14.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.06.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR800440 [ ]; | US2115155 [ ] (BALDWIN BANKS GEORGE); | FR827731 [ ] (MARCONI WIRELESS TELEGRAPH CO); | FR49655E [ ] (ELECTRICAL RES PROD INC); | US2249016 [ ] (GERHARD LUBSZYNSKI HANS, et al); | US2305179 [ ] (GERHARD LUBSZYNSKI HANS); | US2712738 [ ] (JOHANNES WUCHERER, et al); | US3114044 [ ] (STERNGLASS ERNEST J); | US3197662 [ ] (SCHNEEBERGER ROBERT J) | Examination | FR824648 | US2172738 |