EP0012705 - Trailer for transporting road or advertising signs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/13] | Trailer for transporting road signs | ||
[1983/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cerri, Jacques Villa Primerose Rue Ste-Elise St-Jean-du-Var F-83100 Toulon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/10] | For all designated states Cerri, Jacques Villa Primerose Rue Ste-Elise St-Jean-du-Var F-83100 Toulon / FR | ||
Former [1980/13] | For all designated states Rebecq, Jean 213, Ancien Chemin de la Valette F-83100 Toulon / FR | ||
For all designated states Cerri, Jacques Villa Primerose Rue Ste-Elise St-Jean-du-Var F-83100 Toulon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cerri, Jacques Villa Primerose Rue Sainte-Elise Saint-Jean-du-Var F-83100 Toulon / FR | 02 /
Rebecq, Jean 213, Ancien Chemin de la Valette F-83100 Toulon / FR | [1983/19] |
Former [1981/10] | 01 /
Cerri, Jacques Villa Primerose Rue Sainte-Elise Saint-Jean-du-Var F-83100 Toulon / FR | ||
02 /
Rebecq, Jean 213, Ancien Chemin de la Valette | |||
Former [1980/13] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Moretti, René, et al c/o Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado 13008 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/13] | Moretti, René, et al c/o Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado F-13008 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 79430024.4 | 05.12.1979 | [1980/13] | Priority number, date | FR19780035003 | 08.12.1978 Original published format: FR 7835003 | [1980/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012705 | Date: | 25.06.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0012705 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/01, B60P3/00, B62D63/08, B60Q7/00 | [1980/13] | CPC: |
B62D63/064 (EP);
E01F9/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/13] | Title | German: | Transportanhänger für Strassenverkehrs- oder Reklameschilder | [1983/19] | English: | Trailer for transporting road or advertising signs | [1983/19] | French: | Remorque pour le transport de panneaux de signalisation ou publicitaires | [1983/19] |
Former [1980/13] | Transportanhänger für Strassenverkehrsschilder | ||
Former [1980/13] | Trailer for transporting road signs | ||
Former [1980/13] | Remorque pour le transport de panneaux de signalisation | Examination procedure | 14.08.1980 | Examination requested [1981/13] | 15.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.05.1983 | NL | 11.05.1983 | SE | 11.05.1983 | [2003/06] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 11.05.1983 | |
NL | 11.05.1983 | ||
Former [1983/50] | NL | 11.05.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | US3095230 [ ] (LONG WILLIAM R); | US3212645 [ ] (WALDEN SR WILLIAM JULIAN); | FR2037010 [ ] (REBECQ MARIE); | FR2094267 [ ] (PACAUD GERARD); | FR2264683 [ ] (VALLETTE ET PAVON SA ETS [FR]) |