EP0011047 - Oxime derivatives to protect cultivated plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.1984 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.1985 [1985/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szczepanski, Henry, Dr. Waldshuterstrasse 55 CH-4310 Rheinfelden / CH | 02 /
Martin, Henry, Dr. Jupiterstrasse 17 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | 03 /
Föry, Werner, Dr. Benkenstrasse 65 CH-4054 Basel / CH | 04 /
Pissiotas, Georg, Dr. Breslauerstrasse 8 D-7850 Lörrach / DE | [1980/10] | Application number, filing date | 79810077.2 | 27.08.1979 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | CH19780009252 | 01.09.1978 Original published format: CH 925278 | [1980/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0011047 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0011047 | Date: | 03.09.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011047 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/32, A01N37/50, A01N43/28, A01N43/32, C07C131/00, C07D211/16, C07D317/22, C07D319/06 | [1980/10] | CPC: |
C07D295/185 (EP,US);
A01N25/32 (EP,US);
A01N37/50 (EP,US);
A01N43/28 (EP,US);
A01N43/32 (EP,US);
C07C275/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/10] | Title | German: | Oxim-Derivate zum Schutz von Pflanzenkulturen | [1980/10] | English: | Oxime derivatives to protect cultivated plants | [1980/10] | French: | Dérivés d'oxime pour la protection de plantes cultivées | [1980/10] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1979 | Examination requested [1980/10] | 04.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1567075 (GULF OIL CORP [US]); | [A]FR2322861 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [XP]DE2808317 (CIBA GEIGY AG) |