EP0012110 - Process for the dyeing of thermoplastic materials in the mass with anthraquinonylamino triazines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1984 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.1985 [1985/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dazzi, Joachim, Dr. Rütiring 32 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | 02 /
Jost, Max Rebgartenweg 20 CH-4104 Oberwil / CH | 03 /
Wick, Arnold, Dr. Dahlienstrasse 5 CH-4106 Therwil / CH | [1980/12] | Application number, filing date | 79810158.0 | 19.11.1979 | [1980/12] | Priority number, date | CH19780012027 | 23.11.1978 Original published format: CH 1202778 | [1980/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012110 | Date: | 11.06.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0012110 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08L67/00, C09B1/46 | [1980/12] | CPC: |
C09B1/46 (EP,US);
C08K5/3492 (EP,US);
C09B1/516 (EP,US);
C09B1/547 (EP,US);
C09B1/585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Färben thermoplastischer Kunststoffe in der Masse mit Anthrachinonylamino-triazinen | [1980/12] | English: | Process for the dyeing of thermoplastic materials in the mass with anthraquinonylamino triazines | [1980/12] | French: | Procédé de teinture de matières thermoplastiques dans la masse avec des anthraquinonylamino-triazines | [1980/12] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1979 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 23.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1191060 [ ] (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG); | DE1644532 [ ] (GNII ORCH POLUPRODKTOV I KRASI); | FR2086035 [ ] (BAYER AG); | GB1373910 [ ] (YORKSHIRE CHEMICALS LTD) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 84, Nr. 26, 28. Juni 1976, Zusammenfassung Nr. 180931v, Seite 21 Columbus, Ohio, USA, T. KONSTANTINOVA et al.: "On the synthesis of colored unsaturated polyester resins in the presence of dyes, derivatives of 1,3,5-triazine" & Dokl. Bolg. Akad. Nauk 1975, 28(12) 1665-7 * Zusammenfassung * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 85, Nr. 26, 27. Dezember 1976, Zusammenfassung Nr. 193386s, Seite 18, Columbus, Ohio, USA, T. KONSTANTINOVA et al.: "On the synthesis of colored unsaturated polyester resins in the presence of dyes, derivatives of symtriazine" & Dokl. Bolg. Akad. Nauk 1976, 29(7) 1011-13 * Zusammenfassung * |