EP0006080 - A method of manufacturing a laminate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A-Betong AB Box 24 S-351 03 Växjö / SE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersson, Ivar Profossvägen 15 S-240 10 Dalby / SE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Wennborg, Göte, et al Kransell & Wennborg AB Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/40] | Wennborg, Göte, et al Kransell & Wennborg AB Box 27834 S-115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 79850051.8 | 30.05.1979 | Priority number, date | SE19780006188 | 30.05.1978 Original published format: SE 7806188 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006080 | Date: | 12.12.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006080 | Date: | 06.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/00, B32B31/00, E04G9/08 | [1982/40] | CPC: |
B28B7/36 (EP);
B32B3/04 (US);
B28B19/003 (EP);
B29C63/0034 (EP);
B32B13/02 (US);
B32B13/14 (US);
B32B21/10 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
E04G11/365 (EP);
E04G9/08 (EP);
B32B2305/026 (US);
B32B2307/304 (US);
B32B2419/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Schichtstoffes | English: | A method of manufacturing a laminate | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un produit stratifié | Examination procedure | 03.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/22] | 29.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.04.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1983 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | GB191025253 [ ] (WAYSS GUSTAV ADOLF [AT]); | GB1103551 [ ] (ANDERSON & SON LTD D); | FR2045743 [ ] (ELKALITE LTD) |