EP0006832 - A method of refining crude lead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.1981 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boliden Aktiebolag Box 5508 S-114 85 Stockholm / SE | [1980/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersson, Stig Arvid Vintergatan 25 S-932 00 Skelleftehamn / SE | 02 /
Lindkvist, Göran Berzeliusgatan 27 S-932 00 Skelleftehamn / SE | 03 /
Norrö, Allan Ferdinand Hyttgatan 40 S-932 00 Skelleftehamn / SE | [1980/01] | Representative(s) | Lundin, Björn-Eric Boliden Aktiebolag Box 5508 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | Lundin, Björn-Eric Boliden Aktiebolag Box 5508 S-114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 79850059.1 | 15.06.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | SE19780007358 | 29.06.1978 Original published format: SE 7807358 | [1980/01] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006832 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C22B13/02, C22B13/06 | [1980/01] | CPC: |
C22B13/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1980/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Reinigen von Rohblei | [1980/01] | English: | A method of refining crude lead | [1980/01] | French: | Procédé pour le raffinage de plomb brut | [1980/01] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 20.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 07.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SE7317219 [ ]; | SE7317217 [ ]; | DE1174511 [ ] (BROKEN HILL ASS SMELTER); | DE1189279 [ ] (BREVETS METALLURGIQUES); | DE1199003 [ ] (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | US3666441 [ ] (MILNER GEOFFREY); | DE2459756 [ ]; | DE2459832 [ ] |