EP0006838 - Anchoring device for floating working apparatus, particularly for dredgers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Österreichische Schiffswerften Aktiengesellschaft Linz-Korneuburg Hafenstrasse 61 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states Österreichische Schiffswerften Aktiengesellschaft Linz-Korneuburg Hafenstrasse 61 A-4010 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heidrich, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing. Bachlbergweg 53 A-4020 Linz / AT | 02 /
Sauerschnig, Konrad Nr. 101 A-4062 Thening / AT | [1980/01] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 79890014.8 | 08.06.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | AT19780004726 | 29.06.1978 Original published format: AT 472678 | [1980/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006838 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006838 | Date: | 15.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/14, E02F9/06 | [1980/01] | CPC: |
B63B21/14 (EP);
E02F9/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR [1980/01] | Title | German: | Verankerungseinrichtung für schwimmende Arbeitsgeräte, insbesondere für Schwimmbagger | [1980/01] | English: | Anchoring device for floating working apparatus, particularly for dredgers | [1980/01] | French: | Dispositif d'ancrage pour appareils flottants, notamment pour des dragueurs | [1980/01] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/04] | 12.03.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 21.07.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.01.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR453582 [ ]; | US2937610 [ ]; | US1912366 [ ]; | DE1456247 [ ] |