EP0015906 - CIGAR OR CIGARETTE BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAGNER, Hans-Ruedi Route de Plagne 82 2537 Vauffelin/BE / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states WAGNER, Hans-Ruedi Route de Plagne 82 CH-2537 Vauffelin/BE / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/20] | Representative(s) | Gasser, François W. Patentanwalt und Lizenzberater, Reiterstrasse 5A 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | Gasser, François W. Patentanwalt und Lizenzberater, Reiterstrasse 5A CH-3013 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 79900147.4 | 26.01.1979 | [1980/20] | WO1979CH00010 | Priority number, date | CH19780000870 | 26.01.1978 Original published format: CH 87078 | [1980/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO7900551 | Date: | 23.08.1979 | [1979/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0015906 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.1979 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0015906 | Date: | 16.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/24] | Classification | IPC: | A24F15/16, A24F15/20, B65D83/02 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
A24F15/16 (EP,US);
A24F15/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/20] | Title | German: | ZIGARREN- ODER ZIGARETTENSCHACHTEL | [1980/20] | English: | CIGAR OR CIGARETTE BOX | [1980/20] | French: | BOITE POUR CIGARES OU CIGARETTES | [1980/20] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.1979 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1979 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 13.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.12.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB191423965 [ ] (RADFORD RICHARD HEBER); | CH93640 [ ] (THURNER M [DE]); | FR1068034 [ ]; | FR605769 [ ] |