Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2943035 | 15.01.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK132178 | 22.03.1978 | DK250978 | 06.06.1978 | DK7900010 | 21.03.1979 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK141641C | 20.10.1980 | C | DK141641B | 19.05.1980 | B | DK132178 | 23.09.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | DK132178 | 22.03.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK143582C | 15.02.1982 | C | DK143582B | 14.09.1981 | B | DK250978 | 07.12.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | DK250978 | 06.06.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO7900810 | Global Dossier | 18.10.1979 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK132178 | 22.03.1978 | DK250978 | 06.06.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0011630 | Global Dossier | 12.01.1983 | B1 | EP0011630 | 11.06.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK132178 | 22.03.1978 | DK250978 | 06.06.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1119215 | 02.03.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | DK132178 | 22.03.1978 | DK250978 | 06.06.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2035773 | 17.11.1982 | B | GB2035773 | 25.06.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | DK132178 | 22.03.1978 | DK250978 | 06.06.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1165001 | 22.04.1987 | B | Priority number | Date | DK132178 | 22.03.1978 | DK250978 | 06.06.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS55500272 | 08.05.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | DK132178 | 22.03.1978 | DK250978 | 06.06.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL7902264 | 25.09.1979 | A | Priority number | Date | DK132178 | 22.03.1978 | DK250978 | 06.06.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE424948 | 23.08.1982 | B | SE7908302L | 08.10.1979 | L | Priority number | Date | DK132178 | 22.03.1978 | DK250978 | 06.06.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4364518 | 21.12.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | DK132178 | 22.03.1978 | DK250978 | 06.06.1978 |