EP0018370 - ANNULAR SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.09.1983 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): LU State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GLACIER METAL COMPANY LIMITED 368 Ealing Road, Alperton Wembley, Middlesex HA0 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/23] | For all designated states THE GLACIER METAL COMPANY LIMITED 368 Ealing Road, Alperton Wembley, Middlesex HA0 1HD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Alfred "Callerton", 148b Abbots Road Abbots Langley Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
BAKER, George Robert 2, Hamilton Avenue Pyrford Woking, Surrey / GB | [1980/23] | Representative(s) | Arthur, George Fitzgerald, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | [1980/23] | Application number, filing date | 79900398.3 | 17.04.1979 | [1980/23] | WO1979GB00061 | Priority number, date | GB19780015223 | 18.04.1978 Original published format: GB 1522378 | [1980/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO7900943 | Date: | 15.11.1979 | [1979/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0018370 | Date: | 12.11.1980 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.1979 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0018370 | Date: | 03.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/09] | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32, // B63H23/36 | [1982/09] | CPC: |
F16J15/3216 (EP,US);
F16J15/3284 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/23] | F16J15/32, B63H23/36 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, SE [1980/23] | Title | German: | RINGFÖRMIGE DICHTUNG | [1980/23] | English: | ANNULAR SEAL | [1980/23] | French: | JOINT D'ETANCHEITE ANNULAIRE | [1980/23] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1979 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1979 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1980 | Examination requested [1980/24] | 05.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.08.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.10.1982
20.12.1982
ADMISSIBLE HOWALDTSWERKE - DEUTSCHE WERFT Aktiengesellschaft Hamburg und Kiel - Abteilung RRP - Rossweg 20 Postfach 11 14 80 D-2000 Hamburg 11 / DE | [1983/01] | 20.12.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.04.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.06.1983 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 31.08.1983 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1983/48] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 29.08.1980 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 03.03.1982 | LU | 30.04.1982 | [2015/21] |
Former [1985/26] | CH | 03.03.1982 | |
SE | 03.03.1982 | ||
Former [1982/31] | SE | 03.03.1982 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2122222 (FREUDENBERG CARL); | [X]DE864344 (DILLENBURGER ALBERT); | US3120960 [ ] (PIPPERT AARON J, et al); | DE1283534 [ ] (GLACIER CO LTD) |