Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.1984 [1984/45] |
10.09.1983 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.11.1983 [1983/45] |
05.08.1980 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.10.1980 [1980/20] |
05.08.1980 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.10.1980 [1980/20] |