EP0016054 - BRAS WITH ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/20] | BRAS WITH ADHESIVE AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
[1983/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Le Jeune, Danièle, née Rochet Rue du Vignoble 44450 Saint Julien de Concelles / FR | [1980/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/20] | Representative(s) | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 79900691.1 | 29.06.1979 | [1980/20] | WO1979FR00055 | Priority number, date | FR19780019579 | 30.06.1978 Original published format: FR 7819579 | [1980/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000121 | Date: | 07.02.1980 | [1980/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016054 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016054 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/21] | Classification | IPC: | A41C3/10, A41C5/00, D04H13/00 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
A41C3/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, SE [1980/20] | Title | German: | BÜSTENHALTER MIT KLEBSTOFF | [1983/21] | English: | BRAS WITH ADHESIVE | [1983/21] | French: | SOUTIEN-GORGE A ADHESIF | [1983/21] |
Former [1980/20] | BÜSTENHALTER MIT KLEBSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [1980/20] | BRAS WITH ADHESIVE AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
Former [1980/20] | SOUTIEN-GORGE A ADHESIF ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.1980 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/20] | 04.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1983 | [1999/52] | Cited in | International search | [A]US1783512 (MATHER MILDRED C); | [A]US2079426 (MONROE SCHOTTENFELS); | [A]US2793369 (FRANCA PANIGHINI); | FR1167304 [ ]; | US3276449 [ ] (MORGAN BURTON D); | FR2190384 [ ] (CROUZET MAGDELE NE [FR]); | FR2388517 [ ] (KAVOULAKOS STYLIANOS [GR]) |