EP0035991 - MILLING CUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1984 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.1984 [1984/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG S-811 81 Sandviken 1 / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Minoru Ekostigen 23 F S-811 00 Sandviken / SE | [1981/38] | Representative(s) | Forsberg, Lars-Ake, et al Sandvik AB Central Services Patents and Licences 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | Forsberg, Lars-Ake, et al Sandvik AB Central Services Patents and Licences S-811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 79900738.0 | 19.06.1979 | [1981/38] | WO1979SE00140 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8002812 | Date: | 24.12.1980 | [1980/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0035991 | Date: | 23.09.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0035991 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/22 | [1981/38] | CPC: |
B23C5/2278 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1922 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1938 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1981/38] | Title | German: | FRÄSER | [1981/38] | English: | MILLING CUTTER | [1981/38] | French: | FRAISE | [1981/38] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.1981 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/38] | 19.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 20.07.1981 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2715281 ; | [A]GB1303995 ; | [A]GB1414775 (WICKMAN WIMET LTD); | [A]US910413 (PERKINS HIRAM A [US], et al); | [A]US2967442 (FORSYTH JAMES M, et al) |