EP0016076 - QUICK ADJUSTABLE WRENCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.1980 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.1981 [1981/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIDAL, Mauro Gomes Rua Piraquara, 104 Vila Floresta Santo André Sao Paulo 09000 / BR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states VIDAL, Mauro Gomes Rua Piraquara, 104 Vila Floresta Santo André Sao Paulo 09000 / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/20] | Application number, filing date | 79900745.5 | 06.07.1979 | [1980/20] | WO1979BR00006 | Priority number, date | BR19785800987 | 28.07.1978 Original published format: BR 5800987 | [1980/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000324 | Date: | 06.03.1980 | [1980/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016076 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/20] | Classification | IPC: | B25B13/12 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
B25B13/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, SE [1980/20] | Title | German: | SCHNELL REGULIERBARER SCHRAUBENSCHLÜSSEL | [1980/20] | English: | QUICK ADJUSTABLE WRENCH | [1980/20] | French: | CLE A OUVERTURE VARIABLE RAPIDE | [1980/20] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1981/04] | 15.10.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1382248 ; | [X]US1481250 ; | [X]US1511536 ; | [X]US1514017 |