Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.04.1985 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.1985 [1985/25] |
06.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.1984 [1984/45] |
01.06.1984 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.08.1984 [1984/31] |
10.09.1983 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.11.1983 [1983/45] |
06.11.1981 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.1982 [1982/01] |
24.09.1980 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.11.1980 [1980/24] |
05.08.1980 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.10.1980 [1980/20] |