Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2966386D1 | 15.12.1983 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US7900441 | 14.06.1979 | US92564078 | 17.07.1978 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4182822 | 08.01.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | US74012876 | 08.11.1976 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4343927 | 10.08.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US92564078 | 17.07.1978 | US74012876 | 08.11.1976 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8000253 | Global Dossier | 21.02.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92564078 | 17.07.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0016138 | Global Dossier | 09.11.1983 | B1 | EP0016138 | 28.11.1980 | A4 | EP0016138 | 01.10.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92564078 | 17.07.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE5260T | 15.11.1983 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US92564078 | 17.07.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1118938 | 23.02.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US92564078 | 17.07.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS646215B | 02.02.1989 | B2 | JPS55500418 | 10.07.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | US92564078 | 17.07.1978 |