EP0020409 - THE PRODUCTION OF ROTARY SCREEN PRINTING CYLINDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/01] | THE PRODUCTION OF ROTARY SCREEN PRINTING CYLINDERS AND OTHER FINE-APERTURED SHEET MATERIALS | ||
[1983/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1984 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.1984 [1984/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWORD, Wallace Watson 27 Dorrington Road Sale, Cheshire / GB | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Skailes, Humphrey John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Skailes, Humphrey John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 79901142.4 | 21.09.1979 | [1981/01] | WO1979GB00155 | Priority number, date | GB19380022578 | 26.09.1978 Original published format: GB 3822578 | GB19790027603 | 08.08.1979 Original published format: GB 7927603 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000677 | Date: | 17.04.1980 | [1980/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020409 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020409 | Date: | 08.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/23] | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/14 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
B41C1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/01] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG ROTIERENDER SIEBDRUCKZYLINDER | [1983/23] | English: | THE PRODUCTION OF ROTARY SCREEN PRINTING CYLINDERS | [1983/23] | French: | PRODUCTION DE CYLINDRES A IMPRESSION A ECRANS ROTATIFS | [1983/23] |
Former [1981/01] | HERSTELLUNG ROTIERENDER SIEBDRUCKZYLINDER UND ANDERER, MIT FEINEN LÖCHERN VERSEHENER, FOLIENMATERIALIEN | ||
Former [1981/01] | THE PRODUCTION OF ROTARY SCREEN PRINTING CYLINDERS AND OTHER FINE-APERTURED SHEET MATERIALS | ||
Former [1981/01] | PRODUCTION DE CYLINDRES A IMPRESSION A ECRANS ROTATIFS ET AUTRES MATERIAUX EN FEUILLES A FINES OUVERTURES | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1980 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/02] | 09.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1141295 (ELMAR MESSERSCHMIDT DR); | [X]GB1146613 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [X]GB301300 (ANODE RUBBER CO LTD); | DE941885 [ ] (PRAEZ S DRAHTGEWEBEFABRIK); | FR2142596 [ ] (COLOMBO GIOVANNI, et al); | FR1435095 [ ] (UNION GAZES A BLUTER L); | DE1905270 [ ] (KRUEGER ALFRED); | DE1181237 [ ] (ZIMMER PETER); | FR1582692 [ ]; | [A]DE825419 (KUESTERS EDUARD); | [A]FR2225542 (CHAMPION SPARK PLUG CO [US]); | [A]GB756315 (ALMERINDO JAIME CORREIA DE OLI); | [A]FR2147602 (BUSER AG MASCHF FRITZ) |