Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4389435 | 21.06.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US29612881 | 25.08.1981 | US94703678 | 29.09.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8000649 | Global Dossier | 17.04.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94703678 | 29.09.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU530694B | Global Dossier | 28.07.1983 | B2 | AU5130279 | 03.04.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | US94703678 | 29.09.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0020564 | Global Dossier | 07.01.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94703678 | 29.09.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1122236 | 20.04.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US94703678 | 29.09.1978 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2046599 | 19.11.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | US94703678 | 29.09.1978 |