EP0020564 - TOP DRESSED PLAYING SURFACE WITH RESILIENT UNDERPAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.1981 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOD-SOD SPORTS SURFACES 147 East Oakridge Park Metairie, LA 70005 / US | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS Jr., Frederick T. 147 East Oakridge Park Metairie, LA 70005 / US | [1981/01] | Application number, filing date | 79901492.3 | 01.10.1979 | [1981/01] | WO1979US00823 | Priority number, date | US19780947036 | 29.09.1978 Original published format: US 947036 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000649 | Date: | 17.04.1980 | [1980/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020564 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/01] | Classification | IPC: | A01N3/00, A41G1/00 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
B32B5/24 (EP);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B27/065 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
E01C13/08 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | PLANIERTE SPIELOBERFLÄCHE MIT ELASTISCHEM UNTERGRUND | [1981/01] | English: | TOP DRESSED PLAYING SURFACE WITH RESILIENT UNDERPAD | [1981/01] | French: | SURFACE DE JEU APPRETEE AVEC REMBOURRAGE SOUS-JACENT ELASTIQUE | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 22.10.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1981/14] | 22.12.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3661687 (SPINNEY ARTHUR F JR, et al); | [X]US4044179 (HAAS JR FREDERICK T) |