EP0020605 - MODIFIED POLYESTER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Stuart Colin 6000 Whitehouse Drive Evansville, IN 47710 / US | 02 /
DIECK, Ronald Lee 609 Drexel Drive Evansville, IN 47712 / US | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Grever, Frederik, et al General Electric Plastics B.V. P.O. Box 117 4600 AC Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | Grever, Frederik, et al General Electric Plastics B.V. P.O. Box 117 NL-4600 AC Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [1981/01] | Schüler, Horst, Dr. Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 79901585.4 | 23.10.1979 | [1981/01] | WO1979US00880 | Priority number, date | US19780957801 | 06.11.1978 Original published format: US 957801 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000972 | Date: | 15.05.1980 | [1980/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020605 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020605 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L67/02, C08L33/08, C08L69/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/01] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE POLYESTER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1981/01] | English: | MODIFIED POLYESTER COMPOSITIONS | [1981/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POLYESTER MODIFIEES | [1981/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.1980 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.1980 | Search fee paid | 31.05.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/03] | 08.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.1985
16.09.1985
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02
26.09.1985
15.10.1985
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.1985
16.09.1985
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02
26.09.1985
15.10.1985
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | |||
Former [1985/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.1985
16.09.1985
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 19.12.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.02.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.03.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.09.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 31.07.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/51] | Appeal following opposition | 11.10.1988 | Appeal received No. T0506/88 | 30.12.1988 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.07.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 31.07.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.08.1991 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3474050 (CHAPPELEAR DAVID C, et al); | [X]GB1182807 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [X]JPS4918780B ; | [X]US3956229 (BOLLEN PHILLIP STUART, et al); | [X]US4022748 (SCHLICHTING KARL, et al); | [X]US4034013 (LANE CONSTANCE A); | [X]US4035333 (KAMADA KAZUMASA, et al); | [X]US4044073 (BARON ARTHUR L, et al); | [X]US4045514 (IWAHASHI SHUNJI, et al); | [X]US4111892 (KAMADA KAZUMASA, et al); | [X]US4113692 (WAMBACH ALLEN DALE); | [P]US4157325 (CHARLES JOHN J [US], et al); | [P]US4168259 (COLEMAN ERNEST A) |