EP0020657 - INTEGRATED COAL LIQUEFACTION-GASIFICATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.1983 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gulf Oil Corporation P. O. Box 1166 Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15230 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states Gulf Oil Corporation P. O. Box 1166 Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15230 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARR Norman L. 4215 E1 Rancho Drive Allison Park, PA 15230 / US | 02 /
SCHMID, Bruce, K. 10268 E Jewell No. 36 Denver Colorado 80231 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [1981/04] | 01 /
CARR Norman L. 4215 E1 Rancho Drive Allison Park, PA 15230 / US | ||
02 /
SCHMID, Bruce, K. 10268 E Jewell No. 36 Denver, CO 80224 / US | |||
Former [1981/01] | 01 /
CARR Norman L. 4215 E1 Rancho Drive Allison Park, PA 15230 / US | ||
02 /
SCHMID, Bruce, K. 305 South Miami Court Denver, CO 80224 / US | Representative(s) | Huskisson, Frank Mackie FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/01] | Huskisson, Frank Mackie FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1981/01] | Huskisson, Frank Mackie (GB) Intellectual Property Department ZENECA Seeds Jealott's Hill Research Station P.O. Box 3539 GB-Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 6YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 79901660.5 | 22.10.1979 | [1981/01] | WO1979US00878 | Priority number, date | US19780970005 | 15.12.1978 Original published format: US 970005 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8001283 | Date: | 26.06.1980 | [1980/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020657 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C10G1/00, C10G1/08 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
C10G1/006 (EP,US);
C10G1/045 (EP,US);
C10G1/065 (EP,US);
C10G1/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/01] | Title | German: | INTREGRIERTES KOHLEVERFLÜSSIGUNGS-/-VERGASUNGS-VERFAHREN | [1981/01] | English: | INTEGRATED COAL LIQUEFACTION-GASIFICATION PROCESS | [1981/01] | French: | PROCEDE INTEGRE DE LIQUEFACTION-GAZEIFICATION DU CHARBON | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.1980 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.1980 | Search fee paid | 05.08.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 29.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1983/10] | Request for further processing for: | 29.06.1982 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.1982 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.07.1982 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1982 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4102775 (QUARDERER GEORGE J, et al); | [X]US4090943 (MOLL NORMAN G, et al); | [X]US3962070 (STOTLER HAROLD H); | [A]US3884796 (HINDERLITER CHARLES R, et al); | [X]US3540995 (WOLK RONALD H, et al) | [A] - The Pittsburg & Midway Coal Mining Co. "SRC Process Monthly Report"Issued 04 April 1978. | [A] - The Pittsburg & Midway Coal Mining Co, "SRC Process Monthly ReportIssued 07 March 1979. | [A] - Stotler, "H-Coal Pilot Plant Program", Hydrocarbon Research, Vol. 21975 PP. 15-19. | [A] - Electric Power Research Institute, "SRC Quarterly ReportAnalysis of Operations Runs (62-70) 01 January 1976-31 March 1976. |