EP0032160 - Model vehicle track section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.1983 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.1983 [1983/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cheng, Richard C. M. Suite 1604 Austin Center Austin Avenue Kowloon, B.C.C. / HK | [1981/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/29] | Representative(s) | Riederer Freiherr von Paar, Anton Boehmert & Boehmert Kanzlei Landshut Postfach 26 64 84010 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/29] | Riederer Freiherr von Paar zu Schönau, Anton Van der Werth, Lederer & Riederer Postfach 2664 D-84010 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100134.8 | 11.01.1980 | [1981/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032160 | Date: | 22.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A63H19/30 | [1981/29] | CPC: |
A63H19/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/29] | Title | German: | Bahnstück für Miniaturfahrzeuge | [1981/29] | English: | Model vehicle track section | [1981/29] | French: | Elément de voie pour modèle réduit | [1981/29] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/08] | 26.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1983/41] | 29.06.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1983 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3581988 [ ]; | US2764357 [ ]; | US4150789 [ ] |