blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0016308

EP0016308 - Mechanism for rotating and reciprocating a soot blower [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.02.1985
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.04.1985 [1985/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMBUSTION ENGINEERING, INC.
1000 Prospect Hill Road Box 500 Windsor
Connecticut 06095-0500 / US
[N/P]
Former [1983/52]For all designated states
COMBUSTION ENGINEERING, INC.
1000 Prospect Hill Road Box 500
Windsor Connecticut 06095-0500 / US
Former [1981/01]For all designated states
LUMMUS CREST S.A.R.L.
Tour Franklin Cedex No.11
F-92081 Paris La Defense 8 / FR
Former [1980/20]For all designated states
SALZGITTER LUMMUS GMBH
Abraham Lincoln Strasse 1
D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sullivan, Robert Patton
104 Asbury Drive
Chattanooga, Tennessee / US
02 / Jacobs, Clyde Lewis
826 Murrell Road
Signal Mountain, Tennessee / US
[1980/20]
Representative(s)Gross, Gernot K. (DE)
Kleiberweg 5
D-65207 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/52]Gross, Gernot K.
Kleiberweg 5
D-65207 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date80100260.121.01.1980
[1980/20]
Priority number, dateUS1979002399826.03.1979         Original published format: US 23998
[1980/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0016308
Date:01.10.1980
Language:EN
[1980/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0016308
Date:10.12.1980
Language:EN
[1980/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0016308
Date:18.04.1984
Language:EN
[1984/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.1980
ClassificationIPC:F23J3/00
[1980/20]
CPC:
F23J3/00 (EP,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1980/20]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Drehen und Hin- und Herbewegen eines Russbläsers[1980/20]
English:Mechanism for rotating and reciprocating a soot blower[1980/20]
French:Mécanisme pour la rotation et le déplacement longitudinal alternativement dans un sens ou dans l'autre d'un souffleur de suie[1980/20]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure23.02.1981Examination requested  [1981/18]
25.09.1981Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
11.08.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1983Fee for grant paid
30.09.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.1982Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.1984Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2486585  (BRELSFORD HARRY E);
 [A]GB986658  (SUPERIOR AB);
 GB456718  [ ] (JOHN WILLIAM LESLIE SIMPSON);
 BE874576  [ ] (SADACEM);
 US2760222  [ ] (BIRGER ANDERSSON NILS OLOF);
 GB630502  [ ] (BABCOCK & WILCOX LTD);
 [A]BE434882  ;
 US2696016  [ ] (DE MART LE ROY S);
 [A]US2257936  (FRANK BOWERS, et al);
 [A]DE888737  (BABCOCK & WILCOX DAMPFKESSEL);
 US3226258  [ ] (HEIST CHARLES H);
 US3377026  [ ] (DE MART LE ROY S, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.