EP0013968 - Method and device for transporting a web in register and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/16] | Method and device for transporting a web in register and packaging web with register marks | ||
[1983/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.1984 [1984/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Pak Développement SA 70, Avenue C.-F. Ramuz CH-1003 Pully-Lausanne / CH | [1980/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ljungcrantz, Billy En Montimbert CH-1618 Châtel-St-Denis / CH | [1980/16] | Representative(s) | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/12] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61 D-80085 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/16] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Lucile-Grahn-Strasse 38 Postfach 80 13 69 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100300.5 | 22.01.1980 | [1980/16] | Priority number, date | CH19790000765 | 25.01.1979 Original published format: CH 76579 | [1980/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013968 | Date: | 06.08.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013968 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B65H17/22, B26D7/01 | [1980/16] | CPC: |
B26D7/015 (EP);
B65H20/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum registerhaltigen Vorschub einer Wertstoffbahn und deren Verwendung | [1983/38] | English: | Method and device for transporting a web in register and its use | [1983/38] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le transport en registre d'une bande de matériau et utilisation de celle-ci | [1983/38] |
Former [1980/16] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum registerhaltigen Vorschub einer Wertstoffbahn und Verpackungswerkstoffbahn mit Registermarken | ||
Former [1980/16] | Method and device for transporting a web in register and packaging web with register marks | ||
Former [1980/16] | Procédé et dispositif pour le transport en registre d'une bande de matériau et bande de matériau d'emballage pourvue de marques de registre | Examination procedure | 15.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/13] | 02.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.02.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2049135 [ ] (JOSEPH PEYSER); | US2725101 [ ] (VON HOFE GEORGE W); | US3435717 [ ] (MACOMBER JAMES KEITH) |