Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.1984 [1984/38] |
23.07.1983 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.09.1983 [1983/38] |
28.01.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.04.1981 [1981/13] |
20.01.1981 | Change - representative | published on 25.03.1981 [1981/12] |
10.06.1980 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.08.1980 [1980/16] |