EP0016330 - Manipulator provided with a gravity-compensating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1985 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Panissidi, Hugo Anthony 228 Buttonwood Avenue Peekskill, New York 10566 / US | [1980/20] | Representative(s) | Möhlen, Wolfgang IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | Möhlen, Wolfgang C., Dipl.-Ing. IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 80100621.4 | 07.02.1980 | [1980/20] | Priority number, date | US19790021647 | 19.03.1979 Original published format: US 21647 | [1980/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016330 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016330 | Date: | 06.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B25J11/00 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
B25J19/0012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB [1980/20] | Title | German: | Manipulatoranordnung mit einer Einrichtung zur Kompensation der Schwerkraftwirkung | [1980/20] | English: | Manipulator provided with a gravity-compensating device | [1980/20] | French: | Manipulateur pourvu d'un dispositif de compensation de l'effet de la pesanteur | [1980/20] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/21] | 15.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 29.02.1984 | [1985/15] | Documents cited: | Search | DE2245866 [ ] (HAUSER AG HENRI); | US3827333 [ ] (HURD J); | DE2513309 [ ] (VER FLUGTECHNISCHE WERKE); | DE2626397 [ ] (INNOCENTI SANTEUSTACCHIO SPA); | DE2801348 [ ] (ITALPRESSE SPA); | EP0009736 [ ] (FANUC LTD [JP]) |