EP0015409 - Method of controlling the process of cleaning filtration material in textile blocking filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fläkt Aktiebolag Sickla Allé 13 S-131 34 Nacka / SE | [1980/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Apelgren, Roland Stranden Tävelsas S-355 90 Växjö / SE | [1980/19] | Representative(s) | Eitle, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/19] | Eitle, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100691.7 | 11.02.1980 | [1980/19] | Priority number, date | SE19790001181 | 12.02.1979 Original published format: SE 7901181 | [1980/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0015409 | Date: | 17.09.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0015409 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/04, B01D46/46 | [1982/43] | CPC: |
B01D46/04 (EP);
B01D46/4227 (EP);
B01D46/446 (EP);
B01D46/448 (EP);
B01D46/71 (EP);
B01D46/90 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/19] | B01D46/04, // B01D46/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung des Reinigungsverlaufes beim Reinigen von Filtermaterial in textilen Sperrfiltern | [1980/19] | English: | Method of controlling the process of cleaning filtration material in textile blocking filters | [1980/19] | French: | Procédé de commande du processus de nettoyage de matériel filtrant dans les filtres textiles d'arrêt | [1980/19] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/05] | 11.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.04.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE4172 [ ]; | DE2637 [ ]; | DE1058344 [ ]; | DE1097792 [ ]; | DE1228130 [ ] (SLICK IND COMPANY); | DE1507768 [ ] (ALPINE AG); | DE1507843 [ ] (RHEINISCHE KALKSTEINWERKE); | CH527635 [ ] (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]); | CH543295 [ ] (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]); | US3948623 [ ] (PARADIS STEPHEN G, et al); | DE2606146 [ ] (WIBAU GMBH) |