EP0015473 - Process for immobilizing cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.1982 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/19] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heusser, Christoph, Dr. Im Niederholzboden 15 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | 02 /
Stocker, John, Dr. Gstaltenrainweg 67 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | [1980/19] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/19] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Vanderwerth, Lederer & Riederer Patentanwälte Lucile-Grahn-Strasse 22 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80100928.3 | 25.02.1980 | [1980/19] | Priority number, date | EP19790810019 | 28.02.1979 Original published format: EP 79810019 | [1980/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0015473 | Date: | 17.09.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C12N11/08, G01N33/54 | [1980/19] | CPC: |
G01N33/54353 (EP);
C12N11/082 (EP,US);
G01N33/545 (EP);
G01N33/569 (EP);
G01N33/577 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Immobilisieren von Zellen | [1980/19] | English: | Process for immobilizing cells | [1980/19] | French: | Procédé pour immobiliser des cellules | [1980/19] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 25.02.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 04.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1982/34] | 18.05.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1982 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1806418 [ ] (MILES LAB); | GB2004892 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | FR2265758 [ ] (PFIZER [US]); | NL7809332 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | DE2840767 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | US4078971 [ ] (ARKLES BARRY, et al); | DE2840768 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | NL7809205 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | FR2403386 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | FR2321127 [ ] (SINAI SCHOOL MEDICINE CITY [US]); | FR2332287 [ ] (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]); | FR2410012 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | EP0001224 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | GB2005275 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | EP0001223 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 83, Nr. 3, 21. Juli 1975, Seite 358, Nr. 26137p Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. S.Y. WONG et al.: "Immobilization of lymphocytes at surfaces by lectins" & EXP. CELL RES. 1975, 92(2)428-34 * Zusammenfassung * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 88, Nr. 11, 13. Marz 1978, Seite 216, Nr. 70986s Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. BO. MATTIASSON et al.: "An analytical flow system based on reversible immobilization of enzymes and whole cells utilizing specific lectin-glucoprotein interactions" & FEBS LETT. 1978, 85(1)119-23 * Zusammenfassung * |