EP0016366 - Method for preparing microcapsules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/20] | Microcapsules | ||
[1983/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dahm, Manfred, Dr. Am Falkenberg 29 D-5090 Leverkusen 31 / DE | 02 /
Jabs, Gert, Dr. Wingensieferkamp 25 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
Koglin, Bernd, Dr. Zehntweg 27 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 04 /
Schnöring, Hildegard, Dr. Rappenweg 8 D-5600 Wuppertal 11 / DE | 05 /
Riecke, Kurt, Dr. Berliner Allee 34 D-4152 Kempen / DE | [1980/20] | Application number, filing date | 80101047.1 | 03.03.1980 | [1980/20] | Priority number, date | DE19792909950 | 14.03.1979 Original published format: DE 2909950 | [1980/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016366 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016366 | Date: | 26.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/02 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
B01J13/16 (EP,US);
B41M5/1655 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2985 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mikrokapseln | [1983/04] | English: | Method for preparing microcapsules | [1983/04] | French: | Methode de préparation de microcapsules | [1983/04] |
Former [1980/20] | Mikrokapseln | ||
Former [1980/20] | Microcapsules | ||
Former [1980/20] | Microcapsules | Examination procedure | 03.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/20] | 28.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2120873 [ ] (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | GB1359512 [ ] (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | US4003589 [ ] (KONISHI AKIO, et al) |