EP0016979 - Acoustic wave filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.1984 [1984/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/21] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bulst, Wolf-Eckhart, Dipl.-Phys. Arnikastrasse 2 D-8011 Vaterstetten / DE | 02 /
Eschler, Hans, Dr. Auguste-Viktoria-Strasse 110 D-1000 Berlin 33 / DE | [1980/21] | Application number, filing date | 80101065.3 | 03.03.1980 | [1980/21] | Priority number, date | DE19792909705 | 12.03.1979 Original published format: DE 2909705 | [1980/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016979 | Date: | 15.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016979 | Date: | 06.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/64 | [1980/21] | CPC: |
H03H9/14514 (EP,US);
H03H9/14505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/21] | Title | German: | Akustisches Wellenfilter | [1980/21] | English: | Acoustic wave filter | [1980/21] | French: | Filtre à ondes acoustiques | [1980/21] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/23] | 25.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3550045 [ ] (ADLER ROBERT); | US3688223 [ ] (PRATT RONALD GEORGE, et al); | DE2132985 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | FR2265220 [ ] (HAZELTINE CORP [US]); | DE2610183 [ ] (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | DE2615719 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | GB1529942 [ ] (MULLARD LTD) | [ ] - 1973 IEEE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS MONTEREY, 5-7 November 1973, New York, US, A.J. DEVRIES et al.: "A design method for surface-wave filters using simple structures as building blocks", Seiten 441-444 * Das ganze Dokument * |