Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE3158T | 15.05.1983 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP80101673 | 28.03.1980 | DE2913177 | 02.04.1979 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3062865D1 | 01.06.1983 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3062865 | 28.03.1980 | DE2913177 | 02.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0017190 | Global Dossier | 27.04.1983 | B1 | EP0017190 | 15.10.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE2913177 | 02.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8002007 | 23.12.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | DE2913177 | 02.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1134107 | 26.10.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | DE2913177 | 02.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2913177 | 23.10.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE2913177 | 02.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS55132766 | 15.10.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | DE2913177 | 02.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4309298 | 05.01.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | DE2913177 | 02.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA801926 | 25.03.1981 | B | Priority number | Date | DE2913177 | 02.04.1979 |