EP0036901 - Arrangement for producing electron beams in a vacuum discharge vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.1982 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norddeutsche Mende Rundfunk KG Funkschneise 5-9 D-2800 Bremen-Hemelingen / DE | [1981/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preusse, Hans Joachim Stadt Nr. 17 D-2838 Sulingen 4 / DE | [1981/40] | Application number, filing date | 80101721.1 | 01.04.1980 | [1981/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0036901 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/96 | [1981/40] | CPC: |
H01J29/96 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/40] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Erzeugung von gebündelten Elektronenstrahlen in einem Vakuum-Entladungsgefäss | [1981/40] | English: | Arrangement for producing electron beams in a vacuum discharge vessel | [1981/40] | French: | Dispositif pour la production de faisceaux électroniques dans un récipient à décharge sous vide | [1981/40] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 30.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/40] | 08.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1982 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4146673 [ ]; | DE2131356 [ ]; | DE2261359 [ ]; | [A]DE1212173 ; | [A]DE2262286 ; | [A]DE1279216 ; | [AD]DE1192245 |