EP0018515 - Process for the preparation of chenodeoxycholic acid and intermediate products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/23] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Despreaux, Carl 23 Daniel Drive Cedar Grove, N.J. 07009 / US | 02 /
Narwid, Thomas Albert 7 Brooklawn Drive Pompton Plains, N.J. 07444 / US | 03 /
Palleroni, Norberto J. 47 White Oak Drive North Caldwell, N.J. 07006 / US | 04 /
Uskokovic, Milan R. 253 Highland Avenue Upper Montclair, N.J. 07043 / US | [1980/23] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/23] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Vanderwerth, Lederer & Riederer Patentanwälte Lucile-Grahn-Strasse 22 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80101893.8 | 09.04.1980 | [1980/23] | Priority number, date | US19790029420 | 12.04.1979 Original published format: US 29420 | [1980/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0018515 | Date: | 12.11.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0018515 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0018515 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, C07J31/00, C12P33/06 | [1980/23] | CPC: |
C07J9/005 (EP,US);
C07J31/006 (EP,US);
C07J9/00 (EP,US);
C12P33/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1980/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Chenodeoxycholsäure und Zwischenprodukte dazu | [1980/23] | English: | Process for the preparation of chenodeoxycholic acid and intermediate products | [1980/23] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'acide chénodésoxycholique et produits intermédiaires | [1980/23] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 09.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/23] | 30.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.05.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3891681 (SALTZMAN WILLIAM H); | [A]FR2342338 (INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY DEV CORP [US]) |