EP0019708 - Method of manufacturing a triangular blank for a folding triangle in a rotary printing press, and triangular blank so manufactured [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Stadtbachstrasse 1 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hajek, Josef Bürgermeister-Ebner-Strasse 10 D-8904 Friedberg-Stätzling / DE | 02 /
Rotter, Siegfried Neuschwansteinstrasse 14a D-8900 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Schwöpfinger, Hans Dr.-Otto-Meyer-Strasse 18 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | 04 /
Schwarz, Josef Schillstrasse 81 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1980/25] | Application number, filing date | 80101927.4 | 10.04.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | DE19792921757 | 29.05.1979 Original published format: DE 2921757 | [1980/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019708 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019708 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/10, B41F13/58, B65H45/22 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
B23P15/00 (EP,US);
B41F13/58 (EP,US);
B65H45/09 (EP,US);
B65H45/223 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/25] | B41F13/58, B65H45/22, B23P15/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1980/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Trichterbleches für einen Falztrichter einer Rotationsdruckmaschine und danach hergestelltes Trichterblech | [1980/25] | English: | Method of manufacturing a triangular blank for a folding triangle in a rotary printing press, and triangular blank so manufactured | [1980/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un triangle de tôle pour un triangle plieur d'une machine d'impression rotative et triangle de tôle fabriqué selon ce procédé | [1980/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/10] | 16.02.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.05.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.09.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2240397 ; | [A]UST952006I |