EP0017931 - 4H-3,1-Benzoxazine derivatives, methods of their preparation and their use in combating undesirable vegetation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/22] | 4H-3,1-Benzoxazine derivatives, methods of their preparation and their use in combating undesirable vegetation, and substituted benzoyl halides useful as starting compounds for the preparation of 4H-3,1-benzoxazine derivatives | ||
[1984/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1985 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamprecht, Gerhard, Dr. Rote-Turm-Strasse 28 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Wuerzer, Bruno, Dr. Dipl.-Landwirt Ruedigerstrasse 13 D-6701 Otterstadt / DE | [1980/22] | Application number, filing date | 80101957.1 | 11.04.1980 | [1980/22] | Priority number, date | DE19792914915 | 12.04.1979 Original published format: DE 2914915 | [1980/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0017931 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0017931 | Date: | 21.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0017931 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D265/20, C07D265/22, A01N43/86 | [1984/10] | CPC: |
C07D265/22 (EP,US);
A01N43/86 (EP,US);
A01N47/02 (EP,US);
A01N47/04 (EP,US);
A01N47/30 (EP,US);
A01N47/48 (EP,US);
C07C205/59 (EP,US);
C07C43/225 (EP,US);
C07C65/21 (EP,US);
C07D265/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1980/22] | C07D265/20, C07D265/22, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, C07C65/21, A01N43/86, A01N47/02, A01N47/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1980/22] | Title | German: | 4H-3,1-Benzoxazinderivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung zur Bekämpfung unerwünschten Pflanzenwuchses | [1984/10] | English: | 4H-3,1-Benzoxazine derivatives, methods of their preparation and their use in combating undesirable vegetation | [1984/10] | French: | Dérivés de 4H-3,1-benzoxazine, procédés pour leur préparation et leur utilisation dans la lutte contre la végétation indésirable | [1984/10] |
Former [1980/22] | 4H-3,1-Benzoxazinderivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung zur Bekämpfung unerwünschten Pflanzenwuchses sowie substituierte Benzoylhalogenide, die als Ausgangsstoffe für die Herstellung von 4H-3,1-Benzoxazinderivaten dienen | ||
Former [1980/22] | 4H-3,1-Benzoxazine derivatives, methods of their preparation and their use in combating undesirable vegetation, and substituted benzoyl halides useful as starting compounds for the preparation of 4H-3,1-benzoxazine derivatives | ||
Former [1980/22] | Dérivés de 4H-3,1-benzoxazine, procédés pour leur préparation et leur utilisation dans la lutte contre la végétation indésirable, ainsi qu'halogénures de benzoyle substitués utiles comme produits de départ pour la préparation de dérivés de 4H-3,1-benzoxazine | Examination procedure | 19.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/05] | 23.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP83100793.5 / EP0084893 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.04.1984 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [D]BE648259 ; | US3357977 [ ] (ERREDE LOUIS A); | [D]DE1670375 (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG); | FR2121341 [ ] (FERLUX [FR]); | DE2241012 [ ] (CHINOIN GYOGYSZER ES VEGYESZET); | [XD]US3914121 (DOYLE JR WILLIAM C); | [D]DE2556590 (SHERWIN WILLIAMS CO) |